Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HARTWELL PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1145402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 June 2021 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required