Financial history DORSET SEARCH DOGS

Charity number: 1145479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.28k £29.16k £2.43k £21.75k £15.82k
Total expenditure £11.82k £13.00k £5.04k £26.74k £12.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A