Trustees PANTSCANCERS
Charity number: 1147098
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEANETTE ELAINE PRESTON | Chair | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Robert Aldred | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Louise Saddington | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Amanda Coad | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Jane | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.