Trustees ENCOUNTER CHURCH ILFRACOMBE
Charity number: 1145236

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Craig Stuart Mason | Chair | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Hopkinson | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Mason | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Lorna Myra BAKER | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL PARSONS | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Bradley | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Holmes | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.