Financial history PETER VALLANCE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1147364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £18.25k £16.00k £213 £405 £250
Total expenditure £19.00k £19.25k £2.23k £2.31k £1.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A