Financial history THINK JESSICA

Charity Number: 1148186
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £261.59k £50.82k £28.74k £30.96k £10.18k
Total expenditure £87.28k £116.23k £99.33k £68.89k £35.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A