Accounts and annual returns READ AROUND BATH

Charity number: 1145699
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 03 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required