Accounts and annual returns THINKING DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1147071
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2016 12 May 2017 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2015 25 April 2016 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2014 31 May 2015 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2014 16 December 2015 260 days late