Financial history FOOTSTEPS WORCESTERSHIRE

Charity number: 1145927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £139.32k £158.92k £278.60k £50.26k £46.22k
Total expenditure £143.48k £92.97k £83.45k £98.87k £109.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A