Accounts and annual returns THE SHREWSBURY JEUX SANS FRONTIERES TRUST

Charity number: 502416
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required