Financial history AUDLEM DISTRICT AMENITIES SOCIETY

Charity number: 502441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £15.72k £4.23k £9.13k £14.41k £13.38k
Total expenditure £11.12k £3.65k £9.48k £13.10k £18.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A