Trustees THE POPLAR PARTNERSHIP
Charity number: 1145513

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Margaret Durnian | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Anthony Devereux | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Owen O'Regan | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN GRANT | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
FANOULA SMITH | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY IVER | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
TRACY ARGENT | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEE BLEACH | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA FRANKLIN | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.