Financial history LOCAL ENTERTAINERS AND PERFORMERS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1146929
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £28.66k £32.67k £30.07k £18.45k £30.51k
Total expenditure £12.61k £14.53k £14.74k £14.29k £30.51k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £772 £367 £0 £0