Financial history SANKOFA CARE ADOPTION SERVICE

Charity Number: 1147749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/06/2020 19/06/2021 19/06/2022 19/06/2023 19/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A