Financial history CARNBREA ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 502454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.34k £12.58k £12.84k £22.12k £45.18k
Total expenditure £21.08k £10.36k £17.13k £28.67k £50.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A