Financial history MUSICAL MOVING, DANCE FOR PEOPLE WITH PARKINSON'S

Charity number: 1146338
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £10.33k £14.35k £22.15k £635 £333
Total expenditure £13.23k £19.39k £14.03k £16.71k £1.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £910 N/A N/A N/A