Financial history NORTHAMPTON MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY LTD

Charity number: 1146275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.38k £8.45k £105.66k £75.54k £110.77k
Total expenditure £18.88k £3.33k £102.67k £73.57k £124.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A