Accounts and annual returns NORFOLK COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1148076
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 01 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 01 December 2015 On Time