Financial history KOSOVO CONNECTION

Charity number: 1146948
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £662 £604 £501 £1 £0
Total expenditure £100 £531 £198 £65 £2.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0