Trustees STOURBRIDGE NATIONAL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1147230

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Edwards | Chair | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Grazier | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Auden | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carole Singer | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracie Dovey | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dana Yardley | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annmarie Maybury | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Agnes Harris | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Garrad | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dangerfield | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
JEAN ANN JONES | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.