Accounts and annual returns THE HOMELESS FILM FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1146088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2025 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 February 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required