Financial history TURKISH ANIMAL GROUP

Charity Number: 1148352
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018
Total gross income £24.74k £23.57k £58.38k £78.72k £70.07k
Total expenditure £31.66k £41.24k £66.89k £103.41k £84.01k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A