Financial history HEATH CHARNOCK AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 502595
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £3.98k £2.70k £2.77k £3.03k £3.94k
Total expenditure £3.96k £2.41k £2.60k £3.10k £3.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A