Financial history HANNAH'S TREES

Charity number: 1146405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/05/2020 20/05/2021 20/05/2022 20/05/2023 20/05/2024
Total gross income £1.55k £500 £1.06k £2.03k £2.09k
Total expenditure £2.14k £0 £398 £572 £441
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A