Financial history ECLIPSE THEATRE COMPANY LTD

Charity number: 1146907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £676.75k £324.15k £272.33k £265.91k £571.90k
Total expenditure £968.38k £271.47k £228.58k £232.84k £447.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £271.01k £268.46k £254.09k £563.47k
Income - Donations and legacies £249.94k N/A N/A N/A £563.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £213.99k N/A N/A N/A £7.36k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £1.49k N/A N/A N/A £990
Income - Other £211.33k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £968.38k N/A N/A N/A £446.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £450
Expenditure - Governance £80.08k N/A N/A N/A £52.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £450
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0