Financial history SOPER HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1147266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £95.72k £64.81k £76.63k £90.23k £98.06k
Total expenditure £83.82k £67.67k £81.60k £107.55k £72.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A N/A N/A