Accounts and annual returns THE BRIDGE ENTERPRISE (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1148685
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 02 February 2016 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 02 February 2016 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 10 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 28 January 2014 On Time