Accounts and annual returns WORLDSERVE EUROPE

Charity number: 1146370
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 30 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 30 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 29 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required