Accounts and annual returns CAPE CORNWALL SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1146701
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 October 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 18 October 2015 02 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 18 October 2014 02 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2014 Not Required
Annual return 18 October 2013 19 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2013 Not Required