Financial history AGE UK BERKSHIRE

Charity number: 1146462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £874.32k £634.13k £839.49k £942.51k £1.74m
Total expenditure £594.73k £542.28k £566.49k £837.23k £1.06m
Income from government contracts £516.63k N/A £248.00k £597.84k £839.41k
Income from government grants £33.28k £562.99k N/A £27.18k £21.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £290.06k £52.44k £295.03k £14.82k £543.27k
Income - Other trading activities £16.00k £0 £0 £118 £73
Income - Charitable activities £549.91k £562.99k £520.97k £897.82k £1.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.35k £18.70k £23.50k £29.53k £42.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £225 £10.23k
Income - Legacies £275.48k £35.80k £240.85k £500 £533.32k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £589.45k £542.28k £558.61k £829.10k £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £7.88k £8.12k £9.22k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £10.28k £19.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £7.88k £8.12k £9.22k
Expenditure - Other £5.27k £0 £0 £0 £0