Governing document FOUNDATION FOR KNOWLEDGE EXCHANGE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 OCT 2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY IN SCIENCE, HEALTH, SOCIAL SCIENCE AND THE HUMANITIES, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BUT, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ORGANISING CONFERENCES AND MEETINGS, SUPPORTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.