Governing document CHELMER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/11/2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/03/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED WITH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"):- 1. TO CARRY ON THE INDUSTRY, BUSINESS OR TRADE OF PROVIDING SOCIAL HOUSING, OTHER HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, SERVICES AND AMENITIES FOR POOR PEOPLE AND FOR THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY, MENTALLY OR LEARNING DISABLED) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; AND 2. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT PROHIBITED FOR A COMPANY REGISTERED WITH THE REGULATOR AS A NON-PROFIT PRIVATE REGISTERED PROVIDER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.