Accounts and annual returns MARKET SECURITIES CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1146538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2025 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2025 717 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required