Financial history DHIYAHUL-HAG ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF NIGERIA-UNITED KINGDOM BRANCH

Charity Number: 1149621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.48k £2.54k £5.39k £9.64k £8.31k
Total expenditure £6.66k £2.87k £1.62k £5.43k £1.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A