Accounts and annual returns WRITERS IN PRISON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147996
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 May 2017 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 25 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 25 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 27 May 2015 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 28 May 2015 117 days late