Accounts and annual returns SPECIAL NEEDS ACTIVITIES FOR KIDS IN ESSEX

Charity number: 1147695
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2014 21 December 2015 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 19 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required