Financial history ARID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £5.00k £5.20k £5.00k £6.00k £1.20k
Total expenditure £4.90k £5.12k £4.20k £4.00k £96
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A