Financial history ALL SAINTS PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1147120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £194.53k £207.25k £225.98k £259.47k £242.61k
Total expenditure £188.37k £199.75k £209.87k £280.30k £224.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A