Accounts and annual returns IMBUMBA FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1147110
Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 April 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required