Financial history MAYFLOWER SANCTUARY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1147324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £360.35k £471.57k £658.49k £434.78k £716.22k
Total expenditure £308.16k £446.95k £467.32k £568.54k £589.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A £3.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £395.41k N/A £512.68k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £258.70k N/A £20.94k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £165.89k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £557 N/A £15.32k
Income - Other N/A N/A £3.83k N/A £1.39k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £255.00k N/A £157.78k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £465.39k N/A £587.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £1.92k N/A £2.23k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.37k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0