Accounts and annual returns THE TIMMY MASON TRUST

Charity number: 1147176
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 January 2016 16 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2016 Not Required
Annual return 19 January 2015 03 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2015 Not Required
Annual return 19 January 2014 29 January 2015 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2014 Not Required
Annual return 19 January 2013 07 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 January 2013 Not Required