Trustees FRIENDS OF HOLLYCROFT PARK
Charity number: 1148058
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAWN JEFFREY | Chair | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tetyana Shaw | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Neal | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Peter Bullmore | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Neal | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hill | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Hill | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Ann Moore | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JEFFREY | Trustee | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM VICTOR SIMPSON | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.