Accounts and annual returns THE HAPPY SMILE CHILDREN'S COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1148912
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2016 13 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required