Accounts and annual returns LEWISHAM DISABILITY COALITION

Charity number: 1147698
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 March 2016 07 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2016 02 December 2016 On Time