Trustees NESTON UNIVERSITY THIRD AGE (U3A)
Charity number: 1147830

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Grumett | Chair | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Gillian McLeod | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Terry Nugent | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceinwen Bird | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kazimierz John Kaminski | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Eaude | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jeffrey Kynaston | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Mark Buckley | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.