Accounts and annual returns SUTTON TRUST ACTION GROUP COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1148229
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2016 10 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2015 13 March 2016 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2015 13 March 2016 38 days late
Annual return 04 April 2014 07 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2013 13 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2013 Not Required