Financial history THAMES TURBO TRIATHLON CLUB

Charity number: 1147502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £102.33k £69.27k £62.80k £84.22k £78.01k
Total expenditure £122.46k £60.66k £44.97k £85.15k £88.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A