Financial history LUDLOW CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1148012
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £49.82k £46.41k £41.12k £36.95k £14.89k
Total expenditure £49.44k £43.93k £36.52k £34.54k £27.91k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A