Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NORTH WALTHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1148397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required