Accounts and annual returns LISKEARD AND LOOE STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1147941
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 04 February 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 18 November 2015 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 29 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required